TOUGH TO TALK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Increasing awareness of, and reducing the stigma attached to, mens mental health, providing early intervention opportunities for men to work on their mental health, providing training on mental health first aid, creating content, events, partnerships and experiences that encourage men to share their struggles in a supportive environment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 March 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eryn Frost | Chair | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kieran Boland | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Clutterham | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Howells | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF MEN IN NEED IN THE UK, WHO MAY BE EXPERIENCING OR AT RISK OF EXPERIENCING POOR MENTAL HEALTH, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY: A. INCREASING AWARENESS OF, AND REDUCING THE STIGMA ATTACHED TO, MEN’S MENTAL HEALTH B. PROVIDING EARLY INTERVENTION OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEN TO WORK ON THEIR MENTAL HEALTH C. PROVIDING TRAINING ON MENTAL HEALTH FIRST AID D. CREATING CONTENT, EVENTS, PARTNERSHIPS AND EXPERIENCES THAT ENCOURAGE MEN TO SHARE THEIR OWN INNER STRUGGLE IN A FRIENDLY AND SUPPORTIVE ENVIRONMENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 LINBY ROAD
HUCKNALL
NOTTINGHAM
NG15 7TS
- Phone:
- 07812026657
- Email:
- talk@toughtotalk.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.