Accounts and annual returns DROYLSDEN YOUTH CENTRE

Charity number: 521093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 19 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 19 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 28 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 28 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 16 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 31 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 31 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 13 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 13 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window