WESTERN COUNTIES & SOUTH WALES EVANGELISATION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the CIO is to advance the Christian faith for the public benefit in accordance with the Statement of Faith in the Schedule hereto, primarily in England and Wales, and also in such other parts of the United Kingdom or the world as the charity trustees may from time to time think fit.
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 August 2023: CIO registration
- WESTERN COUNTIES TRUST (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joseph Matthew David Maclane | Chair | 29 August 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Mark Bodger | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Paul Dalling | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Chris Bartlett | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Yme Potjewijd | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||||||
GLYN JOHN DAVIES BSC,FCA,CT | Trustee | 29 August 2023 |
|
|||||||||
HIS HONOUR MICHAEL RODNEY BURR | Trustee | 29 August 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Simon Charles Restall | Trustee | 29 August 2023 |
|
|||||||||
NICHOLAS PETER TOWNSEND | Trustee | 29 August 2023 |
|
|||||||||
James Davies | Trustee | 29 August 2023 |
|
|||||||||
ANDREW JAMES STREET | Trustee | 29 August 2023 |
|
|||||||||
ROBERT ANDREW CLATWORTHY | Trustee | 29 August 2023 |
|
|||||||||
STEWART ALAN SIMMONS | Trustee | 29 August 2023 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO, PRIMARILY IN ENGLAND AND WALES, AND ALSO IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. THIS OBJECT WILL BE ACHIEVED MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY ACTIVITIES INTENDED TO SPREAD THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND EDIFY CHRISTIANS, INCLUDING: - THE HOLDING OF PROPERTIES TO BE USED AS PLACES OF CHRISTIAN WORSHIP OR FOR RELATED CHRISTIAN ACTIVITIES; AND - THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND LOANS TO SUPPORT CHRISTIAN WORK. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
122 WELLS ROAD
BATH
BA2 3AH
- Phone:
- 01225436679
- Email:
- admin@wctrust.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.