VEG BOX DONATION SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Veg Box Donation Scheme provides, for the public benefit, the prevention or relief of poverty or financial hardship in the United Kingdom, in accordance with Christian principles, in particular but not exclusively by the provision of healthy food, in the form of vegetable and fruit boxes, to individuals and families in financial need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £1,685 from 5 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 March 2023: CIO registration
- VBDS (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ibim Tamunotein Tumini Banigo | Trustee | 05 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Becky Douglas-Jones | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Huw West | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.69k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF HEALTHY FOOD, IN THE FORM OF VEGETABLE AND FRUIT BOXES, TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN FINANCIAL NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 Sandy Road
Potton
Sandy
SG19 2QQ
- Phone:
- 07944730565
- Email:
- hello@vbds.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window