Financial history FLOOKBURGH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 521103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.73k £10.62k £7.05k £7.27k £9.91k
Total expenditure £8.01k £4.41k £5.08k £8.14k £11.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A