ROYSTON EVANGELICAL CHURCH CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public worship of God and the advancement of the Christian faith in accordance with the Statement of Beliefs and Doctrinal Distinctives in Royston and the surrounding area. By way of Sunday services, Children's activities, Bible studies and running the local Food Bank for the benefit of the residents of Royston and the surrounding villages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 13 March 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Wylie Scott | Chair | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Edward Scorer | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jason Smith | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE PUBLIC WORSHIP OF GOD AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN ROYSTON AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT: AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES, FURTHER THE WORK OF THE CHURCH AND PUT INTO PRACTICE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS PROVIDED THAT THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH PURPOSES MUST BE UNDERTAKEN IN A MANNER THAT IS CONSISTENT WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS AND ANY DOCTRINAL DISTINCTIVES
Contact information
- Address:
-
EVANGELICAL CHURCH
YORK WAY
ROYSTON
SG8 5HJ
- Phone:
- 07999538961
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window