PCC OF SHERBURN IN ELMET

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity oversees worship at All Saints Church, Sherburn in Elmet and local outreach activities, eg in schools. It is also responsible for the maintenance of the Church and the Church Hall, and also the activities that take place in the Church Hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 07 June 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Christopher Wilton | Chair | 07 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Jonathan Sharp | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Gwyneth Stephenson Mrs | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Craig Mason | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Margaret Jones | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Peter Burgis | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Donna Carter | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Avril Evans | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
William Richard Allen | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Kenneth Stott | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
David Morgan-Cox | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Elizabeth Wilton | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Mark Fletcher | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Janet Burgis | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Ronald George Mackin | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Llewelyn Guest | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Caroline Comer-Stone | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Sir John Lane
Sherburn in Elmet
Leeds
LS25 6BJ
- Phone:
- 01977682122
- Email:
- frwilton@aol.com
- Website:
-
sherburninelmetgroup.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window