THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) IN BRITAIN CAMBRIDGESHIRE AREA QUAKER MEETING CHARITIES

Charity number: 1202955
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The CIO undertakes activities to advance the interests of the general religious and charitable purposes of the Religious Society of Friends (Quakers) in Britain within Cambridgeshire and beyond. Income and property are used solely to further the CIOs object through initiatives that support Quaker beliefs, values and to undertake worship, as well as providing pastoral care for members and attenders

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 May 2023: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Graham Waterhouse Chair 01 January 2024
THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) IN BRITAIN CAMBRIDGESHIRE AREA QUAKER MEETING CHARITIES
Received: On time
Martin Harnor Trustee 01 January 2024
ADDENBROOKE'S KIDNEY PATIENTS ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time
THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) IN BRITAIN CAMBRIDGESHIRE AREA QUAKER MEETING CHARITIES
Received: On time
Dr DOROTHY BALL Trustee 01 January 2021
RAILWORLD
Received: On time
THE WANSFORD ROAD CIO
Received: On time
Elizabeth Megson Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0
Total expenditure £0
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
C/O FRIENDS MEETING HOUSE
12 JESUS LANE
CAMBRIDGE
CAMBS
CB5 8BA
Phone:
01223357535