HAMBLETON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 521112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

From Mums & Toddlers, Tennis, Bowls,-Ballet & Tap Dancing, Pilates, Weight Watchers, Sequence Dancing, Social Dancing, Social Singing Group, Knitting & Sewing club, Remote Control Model Truck Club,

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £26,586
Total expenditure: £23,860

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 July 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KEELY JONES Chair
None on record
Frank Bowman Trustee 26 May 2013
None on record
ROY PEAKER Trustee 16 May 2013
None on record
JOHN DAVIES Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £23.14k £7.09k £21.37k £11.93k £26.59k
Total expenditure £16.80k £35.42k £29.54k £34.33k £23.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 May 2024 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MARSH LEA
MARSH LANE
HAMBLETON
POULTON-LE-FYLDE
FY6 9AW
Phone:
07860376580