GREGSON GREEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY, SOCIAL AND SPORTING FACILITIES AND SERVICES FOR THE RESIDENTS OF GREGSON LANE, COUPE GREEN AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £155,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 09 December 1969: Standard registration
- GREGSON LANE COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACQUELINE GIBSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Daniel Woodburn | Trustee | 07 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Bolton | Trustee | 03 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracy O'Reilly | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANN ATKIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.74k | £13.19k | £26.73k | £192.86k | £183.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.78k | £7.94k | £16.52k | £81.79k | £476.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.97k | £1.00k | £157.50k | £155.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01/08/1969 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 10/05/2012
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF HOGHTON AND BRINDLE IN THE COUNTY OF LANCASTER WITH DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF HOGHTON AND BRINDLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 ARROWSMITH DRIVE
HOGHTON
PRESTON
PR5 0DT
- Phone:
- 01254852998
- Email:
- team.gg@gregsongreen.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window