Financial history KIRKBY AND NORTH LIVERPOOL UNIT 218 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 521131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.38k £1.06k £105 £2.26k £2.26k
Total expenditure £1.50k £829 £134 £1.52k £1.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A