ALFRED H KNIGHT FOUNDATION LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A grant making charity for the advancement of education particularly in science, technology, engineering and mathematics, as well as for the relief of poverty and the preservation of health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 February 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew David Knight | Chair | 28 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
David John Leslie Knight | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Alfred Knight | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 JAN 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 SEP 2022 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 OCT 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO: 1.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY IF THE FOREGOING): A) THE AWARDING OF TO SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION; B) THE PROVISION, AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION; C) THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND OTHER FORMS OF SUPPORT WITH A FOCUS ON THE SUBJECTS OF SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY, ENGINEERING AND MATHEMATICS; 1.1.2 THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND / OR REGISTERED CHARITIES WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY; AND 1.1.3 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALFRED H KNIGHT FOUNDATION LTD
KINGS BUSINESS PARK
KINGS DRIVE
PRESCOT
L34 1PJ
- Phone:
- 01514815856
- Email:
- ahk.foundation@ahkgroup.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window