KIRKLAND AND CATTERALL MEMORIAL HALL

Charity Number: 521133
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Responsible for running and maintenance of Village Hall

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £15,766
Total expenditure: £15,820

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 November 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • KIRKLAND MEMORIAL HALL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Russell Trustee 31 March 2014
None on record
DOROTHY WALMSLEY Trustee 31 March 2014
None on record
GURTH WILSON Trustee
None on record
JEAN PARKINSON Trustee
ST HELEN'S SCHOOL CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time
MRS BETTY SINGLETON Trustee
BILSBORROW (GALLOWAY) TRUST
Received: On time
Andrew Wilkinson Trustee
VILLAGE HALL
Received: 124 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £18.55k £22.93k £14.18k £17.74k £15.77k
Total expenditure £10.91k £27.57k £11.00k £15.32k £15.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £10.00k £2.97k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 15 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 15 February 2024 200 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 28 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 12 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 23 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
STONES LODGE
STONES LANE
CATTERALL
PRESTON
PR3 0HA
Phone:
01995603253
Website:

No information available