BERTHA'S LEGACY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote & protect the human rights of women and girls around the world, primarily in Zimbabwe, affected by gender-based violence by: - Raising awareness of domestic abuse and gender-based violence - Relieving the needs of victims of domestic and gender-based violence through: running economic empowerment workshops and self defense classes - Raising funds to support victims.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 22 June 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zanele Carol Bey | Chair | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Daugherty | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sithembile Bertha Chigwada | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF WOMEN AND GIRLS (AS SET OUT IN THE UN CONVENTION ON THE ELIMINATION OF ALL FORMS OF DISCRIMINATION AGAINST WOMEN) AROUND THE WORLD, PRIMARILY IN ZIMBABWE, WHO ARE AFFECTED BY GENDER-BASED VIOLENCE AND DOMESTIC ABUSE BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A) RAISING AWARENESS OF DOMESTIC ABUSE AND GENDER-BASED VIOLENCE AND THE BASIC HUMAN RIGHTS FOR WOMEN NOT TO BE SUBJECTED TO SUCH VIOLENCE. B) RAISING AWARENESS AND ENCOURAGE ZIMBABWE AS A NATION TO SUPPORT AND RESPECT THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF WOMEN. C) RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF VICTIMS OF DOMESTIC AND GENDER-BASED VIOLENCE THROUGH: I. THE RUNNING OF ECONOMIC EMPOWERMENT WORKSHOPS TO IMPROVE THE FINANCIAL INDEPENDENCE OF VICTIMS. II. SPONSORING SELF DEFENCE PROGRAMMES III. PROVIDING FUNDING FOR TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION FOR WOMEN AND THEIR CHILDREN D) COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION THAT AFFECTS VICTIMS OF DOMESTIC AND GENDER-BASED VIOLENCE, MAKING RECOMMENDATIONS BASED ON THE KNOWLEDGE AND EXPERIENCES GAINED FORM BENEFICIARIES SUPPORTED BY THE CHARITY. IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIES OUT ITS OBJECTS. 2) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FREE COUNSELLING SERVICES FOR WOMEN WHO HAVE HAD THEIR HUMAN RIGHTS VIOLATED THROUGH DOMESTIC AND GENDER-BASED VIOLENCE IN ZIMBABWE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
82a James Carter Road
Mildenhall
IP28 7DE
- Phone:
- 07948516873
- Email:
- info@berthaslegacy.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window