GRATEFUL GIVING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- India
- South Africa
Governance
- 20 March 2023: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohmed Yusuf Suleman Raji | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MUHAMMAD SWEB ABDUL KARIM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SAIMABANU YUSUF RAJI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ZAINULABEDIN MEHBOOB SATTAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 April 2025 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
15 April 2025 | 74 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ISLAMIC EDUCATION, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QURAN AND THE TEACHINGS OF PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PBUH) AS INTERPRETED AND ACCEPTED BY THE AHLE-SUNNAH WAL-JAMAA-AH SCHOOL OF THOUGHT; (2) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE WITH ACCESS TO EDUCATION; AND (3) THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF NATURAL DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS AFFECTED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Hextall Road
LEICESTER
LE5 6AG
- Phone:
- 07577380975
- Email:
- yusuf75@me.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window