HAM FARM FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hold an annual music festival in South Gloucestershire, as well as other in-year concerts and musical activities, for the public benefit. We host world-class concerts across many genres (including classical, jazz, folk, world, pop) and stimulating interactive workshops, using public funding to keep ticket prices low, so that our musical events are accessible to all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £7,001 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- Gloucestershire
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 04 May 2023: CIO registration
- HAMFARMFESTIVAL (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Myriam Anne Gamble | Chair | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Bunce | Trustee | 29 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Claire Kateryna Correa | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Gilbertson | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Francisco Jose Correa Sanabria | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 May 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN, AND THE PUBLIC'S APPRECIATION OF, MUSIC AND OTHER ARTS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PRESENTATION OF AN ANNUAL MUSIC FESTIVAL IN SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ham Farm Cottage
Emerson's Green Lane
Emerson's green
Bristol
BS16 7AT
BS16 7AT
- Phone:
- 07909772459
- Email:
- hamfarmfestival@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window