FRIENDS OF WHIRLOW BROOK PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Friends group exists to protect and improve Whirlow Brook Park and the surrounding woodland and waterways. Our income comes from membership fees, donations and grants and is used for: restoration of hard and soft landscaping; recreational activities for park users; and ecological and historical research. Our volunteers do most of the work, all for the benefit of the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 17 July 2023: Standard registration
- FOWP (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shelagh Margaret Woolliscroft | Chair | 03 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER FRANKLIN CAVE | Trustee | 03 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger John Lasko | Trustee | 03 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 DEC 2022 AS AMENDED ON 17 JUL 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AT WHIRLOW BROOK PARK AND THE SURROUNDING WOODLAND AND WATERWAYS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
262 Millhouses Lane
SHEFFIELD
S11 9JA
- Phone:
- 01142366839
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window