SEND VOICES WOKINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SEND Voices Wokingham is the independent Parent Carer Forum, Wokingham Borough, who give a voice to families who have a child or young person aged 0-25 years with any Special Educational Need or SEND). Working in partnership with education, health, social care, and other service providers to make sure the services commissioned meet the needs of children and young people with SEND in Wokingham
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £37,387 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wokingham
Governance
- 18 January 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew George Booth | Chair | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Louise Hooper | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Bejan Bharucha | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Angela Boba | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £37.39k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, INCLUDING THEIR PARENTS, CARERS AND FAMILIES, WHO HAVE DISABILITIES AND/OR SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS IN WOKINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE, PROMOTE THEIR INCLUSION IN THEIR LOCAL COMMUNITIES AND TO HELP AND SUPPORT THEM TO REACH THEIR FULL POTENTIAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 THE MANOR
SHINFIELD
READING
RG2 9DP
- Phone:
- 07890233721
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window