ARIANA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Afghanistan
Governance
- 15 June 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIFATULLAH RAHIMEE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
UZAIRULHAQ AMANGUARA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ZAMAROT AFGHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN AFGHANISTAN BY PROVIDING ESSENTIAL ITEMS, SUCH AS FOOD AND CLOTHING, TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED. THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN AFGHANISTAN WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR, NATURAL DISASTER OR HUMANITARIAN CRISIS IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION ASSISTANCE TO REBUILD AND RESTORE DAMAGED BUILDINGS OR LAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLAT 99 BUSH COURT
SHEPHERDS BUSH GREEN
LONDON
W12 8PL
- Phone:
- 07360008000
- Email:
- info@arianafoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window