Accounts and annual returns ASSOCIATION OF JEWISH EX-SERVICEMEN AND WOMEN (FOOTBALL SECTION) MERSEYSIDE BRANCH TRUST FUND

Charity number: 521151
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 August 2024 208 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 February 2021 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required