OUNDLE MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing and maintaining a museum to acquire, preserve, and display items of historical interest relating to Oundle and its environs to advance the education of the public in Oundle and the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 02 March 2023: CIO registration
- 05 May 2023: Funds received from 1045378 OUNDLE MUSEUM TRUST
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Frederick Christopher Fuller | Chair | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Donald Campbell | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Carole Bancroft-Turner | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Carmel Cecilia Crawley | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
VALERIE ANN CHESSER | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
DR MAX SCHURER | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|||||||
David Antony Chapple | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN OUNDLE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A MUSEUM TO ACQUIRE, PRESERVE, AND DISPLAY ITEMS OF HISTORICAL INTEREST RELATING TO OUNDLE AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
OUNDLE MUSEUM
THE COURT HOUSE
MILL ROAD
OUNDLE
PETERBOROUGH
PE8 4BW
- Phone:
- 01832272735
- Email:
- info@oundlemuseum.org.uk
- Website:
-
oundlemuseum.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window