THE BOWEN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing charitable activities such as pond digging and glade clearance. Advancement of education for the public benefit in nature conservation and protection of biological diversity. Providing grants to individuals / organisations in financial hardship in the Canterbury, Kent area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England
Governance
- 25 April 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Pamela Boraston | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Daniel John Tuson | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adele Margaret Horton | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HORTON | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY PROMOTING BIODIVERSITY THROUGH ACTIVITIES SUCH AS (PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY), POND DIGGING AND GLADE CLEARANCE. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN NATURE CONSERVATION AND THE ENHANCEMENT AND PROTECTION OF BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY TO ADVANCE SUCH OBJECTS OR PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
KRESTON REEVES LLP
37 ST. MARGARET'S STREET
CANTERBURY
CT1 2TU
- Phone:
- 01227701999
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window