KASKOSAN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Workshops on Romani language and culture, GRT club activities, events, and production of digital content in relation Romani language and culture such as history, language, customs, music, healthy eating and cooking, story telling and music/dance workshops. Promotion of volunteering in Romani communities, advocacy and advice service in Romani language both online and face to face
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- Oldham
- Rochdale
Governance
- 07 December 2023: CIO registration
- KASKOSAN (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janos Lang | Chair | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dan Christopher Allen | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Allison Hulmes | Trustee | 06 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carly Sara Rebecca Henderson | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil McAlister | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, GYPSY, ROMA AND TRAVELLER PEOPLE AND THOSE OF GYPSY, ROMA AND TRAVELLER HERITAGE THROUGHOUT THE UK, WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF OR CREED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: • INCREASING OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE GYPSY, ROMA AND TRAVELLER COMMUNITY TO ENGAGE WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS, TO ENABLE THOSE PROVIDERS TO ADAPT SERVICES TO BETTER MEET THE NEEDS OF THAT COMMUNITY. • PROVIDING PEER SUPPORT AND OTHER ACTIVITIES THAT BUILD PEOPLE’S CONFIDENCE AND ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY. • PROMOTING EDUCATIONAL, TRAINING, SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL EVENTS INVOLVING THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. • BUILDING PEOPLE’S KNOWLEDGE AND CONFIDENCE IN THEIR OWN CULTURAL HERITAGE AND ITS POTENTIAL CONTRIBUTION TO A MULTI-CULTURAL SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16
Wood Street
BOLTON
BL1 1DY
- Phone:
- 07422617894
- Email:
- kaskosan@gmail.com
- Website:
-
kaskosan.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.