THE CHELWOOD AND DISTRICT WELFARE ASSOCIATION (C A D W A )

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities offered at CADWA are:- Ofsted Registered Pre-School Nursery: Indoor Bowls; Crown Green Bowls: 2 Table Tennis Teams: Line Dancing: Jujitsu: Various Dance Classes (children ) Camera Club: Karate:
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 04 July 1966: Standard registration
- C A D W A (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROY SMYTH | Chair | 04 April 1995 |
|
|
||||
PHILLIP ASHCROFT | Trustee | 26 May 1992 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.24k | £79.62k | £61.62k | £51.35k | £84.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.53k | £64.63k | £73.31k | £64.61k | £91.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.30k | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 December 2024 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 December 2024 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED JUNE 1950 AS AMENDED MARCH 1977
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCIAL, MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT
Area of benefit
CHELWOOD AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 WELBOURNE ROAD
LIVERPOOL
L16 6AJ
- Phone:
- 01517226425
- Email:
- cadwa@cadwa.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window