REVIVAL MISSION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity advances the Christian faith through services, pastoral care, and educational programs. We support vulnerable communities globally and in London (planned for 2025) with food banks, feeding for homeless and addiction projects. Led by Pastor Volodymyr Muntianu, we offer spiritual and practical help, aiming to grow through church planting, conferences, and family-oriented services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 30 June 2023: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Volodymyr Muntianu | Chair | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aiday Mokenova | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Viola Nistrianu | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jyldyz Alygulova | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Viktoriia Muntianu | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO (OBJECTS) ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO: (A) ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) THROUGH: (I) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC RELIGIOUS WORSHIP AND TEACHING AS A CHURCH; (II) INTRODUCING NON-BELIEVERS TO THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; AND (III) ESTABLISHING AND SUPPORTING NEW CHURCHES; (B) ADVANCE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES, FURTHER THE WORK OF THE MISSION BY PUTTING INTO PRACTICE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION: (I) THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF NEED, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS; AND (II) THE PROVISION OF ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. IN EACH CASE IN LONDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, THROUGHOUT THE UK AND ACROSS THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 ST. GEORGES HOUSE
BRIDGEWAY STREET
LONDON
NW1 1QS
- Phone:
- 07471660968
- Email:
- violettanistryanu@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window