BYACHAD YOUTH PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
After school activities and programs. Day trips and events during school holidays.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
Governance
- 17 February 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gershon Rose | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Emmanuel Schleider | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chaim Dovid Myer NISSENBAUM | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 CAVENDISH ROAD
SALFORD
M7 4WW
- Phone:
- 01617981660
- Email:
- admin@byachad.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window