BLESS COMMUNITY SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bless offers daily activities which universally aim to reduce isolation and loneliness across a diverse range of ages, backgrounds, health and abilities. We currently deliver our services from our two bases: Upton and North Elmsall Village Hall and our centre in Hemsworth. Many of our activities centre around a creative, physical or educational theme to help people re-engage with their community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnsley
- City Of Wakefield
- Doncaster
- Leeds City
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 23 February 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barry Cannon | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bradley David Ellis | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Griffin | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Pauline Robinson | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Ross | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 HIGHFIELD CENTRE
HEMSWORTH
PONTEFRACT
WF9 4SH
- Phone:
- 07907106360
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window