COMMONWEALTH CLIMATE AND LAW INITIATIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Australia
- Canada
- Hong Kong
- India
- Malaysia
- Philippines
- Singapore
- South Africa
Governance
- 09 June 2023: Standard registration
- CCLI (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr John Purcell | Chair | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Shippen | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia Williams | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Thom Wetzer | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Eleanor Mulholland | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Sarah Kilgour | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Benjamin Caldecott | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Janis Sarra | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £332.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £248.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 FEB 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 JUN 2022
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO ADVANCING THE PROTECTION, PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (1) RESEARCHING STRATEGIES AND MECHANISMS THAT MAY ASSIST TO FACILITATE A RAPID, ORDERLY AND EFFICIENT RE-ALLOCATION OF CAPITAL TO BUSINESS AND INVESTMENT ACTIVITIES THAT PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE TRANSITION TO A GLOBAL LOW CARBON ECONOMY TO ADDRESS THE THREAT OF CATASTROPHIC CLIMATE CHANGE, AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH; (2) RESEARCHING THE MATERIAL RISKS OF FUTURE LEGAL LIABILITIES FOR COMPANY DIRECTORS AND PENSION FUND TRUSTEES, AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH, IN ORDER TO MOTIVATE A BEHAVIOURAL SHIFT TO TAKING ACCOUNT OF PHYSICAL CLIMATE CHANGE RISK AND SOCIETAL RESPONSES TO CLIMATE CHANGE IN CORPORATE AND INVESTMENT DECISION-MAKING; (3) PROMOTING THE INTEGRATION OF THE FINANCIAL RISKS AND OPPORTUNITIES OF CLIMATE CHANGE ACROSS ALL FACETS OF CORPORATE GOVERNANCE AND INVESTMENT PRACTICE; AND (4) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE LAW, PRACTICE AND ADMINISTRATION OF JUSTICE IN CONNECTION WITH CLIMATE CHANGE, SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
128 City Road
London
EC1V 2NX
- Phone:
- 07860275169
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window