JADE'S BAGS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Jades Bags Charity provide essential items such as food parcels, toiletries, clothing including school uniforms for those people referred via Social Services, Mental Health Services or any other organisation caring for vulnerable adults, families in Lancashire. We also receive Self referrals from individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 06 March 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Meade Mcloughlin | Chair | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Smith | Trustee | 02 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Afflick | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracie Neil | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Rizza | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Anderson | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roxey-Anne Afflick | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alex Cowie | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 03 April 2025 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 03 April 2025 | 124 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
PROVIDING RELIEF TO THOSE IN THE PRESTON AREA OF LANCASHIRE WHO ARE IN NEED DUE TO ILL HEALTH, POVERTY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND DOMESTIC ABUSE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FOOD PARCELS AND GIFT BAGS THAT CONTAIN ESSENTIAL ITEMS SUCH AS CLOTHING, TOILETRIES, BABY ITEMS AND OTHER SUCH THINGS IDENTIFIED BY TRUSTEES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 HAZEL CLOSE
CLAYTON-LE-WOODS
CHORLEY
PR6 7FL
- Phone:
- 07791259941
- Email:
- Info@jadesbags.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window