THE PATTERSON FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1201583
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General Charitable Purposes. Trust is open to applications. Please submit your application to https://funding.ludlowtrust.com

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 09 January 2024

Total income: £16,347
Total expenditure: £12,612

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 January 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gillian Margaret Patterson Trustee 09 January 2023
None on record
David Hugh Patterson Trustee 09 January 2023
None on record
Ludlow Trust Company Ltd Trustee 06 January 2023
THE KEBONY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
The Richard and Claire Watts Foundation
Received: On time
GREEN FAMILY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE SIEBERT CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
OPTIGENE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE HOLLY HOUSE CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MCGRATH TAYLOR FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
CHANGE SOMETHING FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE FUTURE ECHO CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 09/01/2024
Total gross income £16.35k
Total expenditure £12.61k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 09 January 2024 01 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 January 2024 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
LUDLOW TRUST CO LTD
FIRST FLOOR
TOWER WHARF
CHEESE LANE
BRISTOL
BS2 0JJ
Phone:
01173138200