Financial history CITY OF LIVERPOOL UNIT (217) OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 521175
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £32.95k £14.00k £38.44k £13.12k £25.65k
Total expenditure £32.41k £8.37k £19.11k £28.42k £22.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £16.00k £6.00k £13.61k £5.14k £15.43k