NORMANDY DEAN GREEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is currently negotiating with Bury Council for a contract to manage a plot of land next to Dean Street and Normandy Crescent in Radcliffe, Manchester. This has been and is currently the sole activity. It is expected that a contract will be agreed late in 2024 or early in 2025. Once a contract is agreed we will manage the plot of land to provide a recreational space for all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bury
Governance
- 03 April 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beth Young | Chair | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Harney | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Louise Ebbrell | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF RADCLIFFE, MANCHESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 NORMANDY CRESCENT
RADCLIFFE
MANCHESTER
M26 3TD
- Phone:
- 07969989817
- Email:
- NormandyDeanGreen@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window