SERENS WISH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Serens Wish provides support through assistance with daily essentials, presents at birthdays, christmas and other celebrations in addition to signposting to the relief of poverty and social economic disadvantage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £3,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 01 February 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Marschall | Chair | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
lee dixon | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jones | Trustee | 28 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Libby Cleal | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bethan Davis | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE COUNTY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE, ENGLAND BY THE PROVISION OF TOILETRIES, CLOTHING AND OR EQUIPMENT TO CHILDREN, BABIES AND THE PARENTS / CARERS THEREOF WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF SOCIAL AND OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 Little Grebe Road
Bishops Cleeve
CHELTENHAM
GL52 8HP
- Phone:
- 07776301767
- Email:
- INFO@SERENSWISH.CO.UK
- Website:
-
WWW.SERENSWISH.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window