RAINHAM BOXING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Havering
Governance
- 18 May 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kelvin Wing | Chair | 04 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Kevin Bowers | Trustee | 04 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Clark | Trustee | 04 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £595 | |
|
Total expenditure | £910 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 07 March 2025 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, OF THE AMATEUR SPORT OF BOXING IN RAINHAM ESSEX, AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PARTICIPATION IN THE SPORT OF BOXING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ORIGIN HEALTH & FITNESS
SUTTONS BUSINESS PARK
NEW ROAD
RAINHAM
RM13 8DE
- Phone:
- 07912044699
- Email:
- kb1458@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window