THE OVERSEAS AID ALLIANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OAA will make grants to organisations working overseas. This will provide funds for projects involved with improving the health, education and development of those in the greatest need
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Bangladesh
- Cambodia
- India
- Malawi
- Tanzania
- Zambia
Governance
- 28 March 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Stella Caroline Russell FRCGP | Chair | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Anthony Joseph Paluch MB.BS | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicholas Anthony Paluch MRCGP | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Stuart Robertson MSc | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.77k | £10.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.52k | £35.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 06 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 06 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY, IN PARTICULAR IN THE LEAST DEVELOPED NATIONS OF THE WORLD, BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO COMMUNITIES IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OLD RECTORY
SEVEN SISTERS ROAD
ST. LAWRENCE
VENTNOR
PO38 1UZ
- Phone:
- 01983852211
- Email:
- scrussell@doctors.org.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window