TEAM MACY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide life saving equipment to local areas or hospitals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 January 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 February 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Cruickshanks | Chair | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Paloma Cotton | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Parker | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Dalton | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Clark | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Paul Cruickshanks | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Mark Dalton | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Kenny | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP CLARK | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Raine | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 January 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 January 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO; 1.RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: A.FUNDING RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, DIAGNOSIS, TREATMENT AND OR MANAGEMENT OF ILLNESS, PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AT THE ROYAL BROMPTON HOSPITAL FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY PATIENT WITH CONGENITAL HEART DEFECTS AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. B.PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF AUTOMATED EXTERNAL DEFIBRILLATORS IN HERTFORDSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREA. 2.THE RELIEF OF NEED AMONG THE CARERS FOR AND PEOPLE WITH CONGENITAL HEART DEFECTS BY PROVIDING AND WORKING WITH OTHERS TO PROVIDE ITEMS, SERVICES, INFORMATION AND ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 Tile Kiln Lane
Hemel Hempstead
HP3 8NH
- Phone:
- 07855990864
- Email:
- helen@teammacy.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window