WE ARE HUMANS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention and relief of poverty, especially food poverty, by providing food, including cooked food, other essentials and support and advice to those residents of Dorset and surrounding areas who are homeless and/or in financial need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bournemouth
- Poole
Governance
- 02 February 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Francis Lesley Talbot | Chair | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Malgorzata Maria Roj | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Elaine Lawrence | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Charles Easter | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clive Ashley Wingfield | Trustee | 29 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Talbot | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Francis Feeney | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY, ESPECIALLY FOOD POVERTY, BY PROVIDING FOOD, INCLUDING COOKED FOOD, OTHER ESSENTIALS AND SUPPORT AND ADVICE TO THOSE RESIDENTS OF DORSET AND SURROUNDING AREAS WHO ARE HOMELESS AND/OR IN FINANCIAL NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 SEA ROAD
BOSCOMBE
BOURNEMOUTH
BH5 1DH
- Phone:
- 07733721703
- Email:
- Wearehumans1@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window