MANCHESTER CHRISTIAN BRETHREN CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- India
Governance
- 14 February 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHAJU PALAMATTAM GERVADESE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
BIJOY TITUS | Trustee | 14 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALBERT KALLARAKUNNEL BABU | Trustee | 14 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROY MATHEW THARIAN | Trustee | 14 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 February 2025 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 February 2025 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR CHRISTIAN WORSHIP, PRAYER, RELIGIOUS EDUCATION, CELEBRATING RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, CONDUCTING RELIGIOUS CEREMONIES, OUTREACH AND PASTORAL CARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Crawford Drive
Eaton
CONGLETON
Cheshire
CW12 2GL
- Phone:
- 07735536832
- Email:
- spgervadese@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window