DOGGY DENS UK RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity promotes humane behaviour towards dogs both in the UK and Romania, by providing appropriate care, protection, treatment, safe shelter and security for dogs in need by reason of mistreatment, abandonment, poor circumstances or ill usage. We actively seek homes for rescued animals and advance public understanding of dog welfare by providing training support to adopters
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Macedonia
- Romania
Governance
- 19 May 2023: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Turner Mrs | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Carter | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Denise Margaret Akbani | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 May 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS DOGS BOTH IN THE UK AND IN MACEDONIA AND ROMANIA BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT, SAFE SHELTER AND SECURITY FOR DOGS IN NEED OF CARE BY REASON OF MISTREATMENT, ABANDONMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE. TO ACTIVELY SEEK HOMES FOR RESCUED ANIMALS AND ADVANCE PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF DOG WELFARE BY PROVIDING TRAINING SUPPORT TO ADOPTERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHIREOAKS HILL FARM
CRESWELL ROAD
CUCKNEY
MANSFIELD
NG20 9NW
- Phone:
- 07773285175
- Email:
- Doggydenshomecheck@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window