MOSDOS TOLDOS ARON LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance such charitable purposes (according to the law of England and Wales) as the trustees see fit from time to time in particular but not limited to advancing the Jewish religion, advancing Jewish religious education and the alleviation of poverty among the Toldos Aron community in Israel and throughout the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Israel
Governance
- 23 June 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Moshe Liebenthal | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Avraham Shmuel Schischa | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
ABRAHAM JUST | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £420.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £413.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 MAY 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 JAN 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO ADVANCING THE JEWISH RELIGION, ADVANCING JEWISH RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AND THE ALLEVIATION OF POVERTY AMONG THE TOLDOS ARON COMMUNITY IN ISRAEL AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
59 DARENTH ROAD
LONDON
N16 6ES
- Phone:
- 02034043635
- Email:
- MOSHELIEBENTHAL26A@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window