THE PAD PROJECT UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Pad Project UK recycles your unopened Hygiene Continence Care products, health care items and Health Care Equipment. We operate from our main hub in Hemel hempstead and have Drop Zones in different areas where the public can donate to. These items are then taken back to the Hub for distribution, where they are given out to individuals or partner groups that are in desperate need of them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 June 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH REBECCA PARKINS | Chair | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Huggins | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Frances Orr | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF PATIENTS IN THE UK BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF INCONTINENCE PADS AND OTHER PERSONAL HYGIENE ITEMS ANCILLARY TO THOSE PROVIDED BY THE NHS AND OTHER MEDICAL SERVICES PROVIDERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Protea Business Centres
Bridge House
High Street
Redbourn
ST. ALBANS
Hertford
- Phone:
- 07936448044
- Email:
- info@thepadprojectuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window