Financial history MANCHESTER MACCABI COMMUNITY AND SPORTS CLUB

Charity number: 521228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £454.79k £245.61k £238.94k £522.08k £414.29k
Total expenditure £262.75k £206.77k £258.89k £299.39k £338.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £12.00k £2.54k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £96.15k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £3.24k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £139.55k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £297.75k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £1.64k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £11.80k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A