THE ELEVEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Aiming to raise funds to create a network of refuges for women and children escaping Domestic Abuse.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 30 August 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Antoinette Pane | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Berglund | Trustee | 30 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Brisbourne | Trustee | 30 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 10 March 2025 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | 12 March 2025 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF VICTIMS AND SURVIVORS OF ANY AGE WHO ARE IMPACTED BY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AND RELATED ABUSE THOUGH THE PROVISION OF HOUSING, ACCOMMODATION, EDUCATION, TRAINING, COUNSELLING AND MONEY ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
XXX
XXXX
London
N5 2LU
- Phone:
- 07527285168
- Email:
- DIRECTOR@THEELEVEN.INFO
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window