BROUGHTON FIELDS FUN FRIENDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our activities promote a co-operative partnership between the governing body,staff,parents and others associated with the school and engage the pupils, and at times whole school community, often of a social nature, to events and activities that fundraise to provide facilities or equipment that support the school.Examples include, a Summer Fair, Bag2School, Cookie Fridays and a Easter Competition.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 21 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 March 2023: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMMA KIDD | Chair | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Lewis | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deepa Harishkumar Shah | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Calder | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura de Ste Croix | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jaiyna Westwood | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA GUY | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 21/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 21 July 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 July 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JAN 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BROUGHTON FIELDS PRIMARY SCHOOL
MILTON ROAD
BROUGHTON
MILTON KEYNES
MK10 9LS
- Phone:
- 01908235994
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window