SOUTHWELL CATHEDRAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(a) to advance the Christian religion in accordance with the faith and practice of the Church of England, in particular by furthering the mission of the Church of England; (b) to care for and conserve the fabric and structure of the Cathedral Church building; (c) to advance any other charitable purposes ancillary to the furtherance of (a) and (b)
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 21 February 2024: Standard registration
- SOUTHWELL MINSTER (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Very Revd Nicola Sullivan | Chair | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
The Revd Canon Dr Richard John Frith Ph.D. | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
The Revd Canon Paul Damian Rattigan | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Robert Alexander | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Arwel Huw Griffiths | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Canon Philip John Blinston MEd | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev'd Canon STEPHEN DAVID SILVESTER | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Janet Celia Richardson BA JP | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|||||
ANDREW MAURICE CORNER | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 NOVEMBER 2023 IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CATHEDRALS MEASURE 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHAPTER ARE (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FAITH AND PRACTICE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, IN PARTICULAR BY FURTHERING THE MISSION OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND; (B) TO CARE FOR AND CONSERVE THE FABRIC AND STRUCTURE OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH BUILDING; (C) TO ADVANCE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE ANCILLARY TO THE FURTHERANCE OF THE PURPOSE REFERRED TO IN SUB-PARAGRAPH (A) OR (B). THE CHAPTER MUST ACT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITHIN THE MEANING OF SECTION 4(3) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2011.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Minster Centre
Church Street
Southwell
NG25 0HD
- Phone:
- 01636812649
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.