UNIVERSITY OF MANCHESTER INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the education of students and others in Greater Manchester To provide social, cultural and recreational facilities which will improve their conditions of life by enabling them to participate more fully in the life of the communities to which they belong of which they have need because of their diverse social, cultural and racial origins and often lack of financial means.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
Governance
- 10 June 1969: Standard registration
- INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Simon Merrywest | Chair | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Ward | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Cotton | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Tanya Luff | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £427.36k | £247.44k | £179.24k | £144.21k | £191.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £504.09k | £213.18k | £151.80k | £173.91k | £183.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.46k | £56.81k | £7.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 06 September 2024 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 06 September 2024 | 98 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 04 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 04 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 NOVEMBER 1968 AS AMENDED 19 MAY 1969
Charitable objects
I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS OR OTHER PERSONS IN OR NEAR THE CITY OF MANCHESTER AND PARTICULARLY IN INTERNATIONAL MATTERS. II) THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR STUDENTS. III) THE PROVISION OF RESIDENTAL ACCOMMODATION FOR STUDENTS TO ASSIST THEM TO OBTAIN OR BENEFIT FROM EDUCATION OR TO UNDERTAKE RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
IN OR NEAR THE CITY OF MANCHESTER
Linked charities
- 10 June 1969 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
International Society
c/o UMSU
Oxford Road
MANCHESTER
M13 9PR
- Phone:
- 01612754959
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window