MAWDESLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Hire to groups such as: Playgroup, Beavers, Cubs, Guides, Scouts, Tennis, W.I., Parish Council Meetings, Band Practice, Drama, Dancing -Ballroom, Line, Ballet, U3A activities plus a number of other groups. Functions: Weddings, Birthdays, Dances, Education, Sales, Quizes, Shows and fund-raising events for other organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 14 April 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Woods | Chair | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Anne Mawdsley | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Woolley | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carole Rachael Keeling | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|||||
John Donald Taylor | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Travis | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Carr Mitchell | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Richard Gordon Johnston | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|||||
BARBARA DORIS NICHOLS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.95k | £43.39k | £67.78k | £110.88k | £89.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.63k | £46.52k | £56.33k | £112.73k | £98.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.68k | £16.34k | £3.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 March 2023 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 March 2023 | 127 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17/01/1970 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 18/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 09/06/2015 as amended on 16 Feb 2021 as amended on 16 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF MAWDESLEY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MAWDESLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mawdesley Village Hall
Hurst Green
Mawdesley
ORMSKIRK
Lancashire
L40 2QT
- Phone:
- 01704822481
- Email:
- mvh.events@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window