Trustees MAWDESLEY VILLAGE HALL
Charity Number: 521251

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Woods | Chair | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Anne Mawdsley | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Woolley | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carole Rachael Keeling | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|||||
John Donald Taylor | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Travis | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Carr Mitchell | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Richard Gordon Johnston | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|||||
BARBARA DORIS NICHOLS | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.