EDISON'S LIGHT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide support to families affected by miscarriage, still-birth, termination for medical reasons (TFMR) and neonatal death. We do this by providing items such as sibling bereavement support packs and other resources directly to hospitals and individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 21 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 April 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Anne Yarlett | Chair | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Richard Brothwell | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Thomasina Agnes Hargreaves | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Anne Rogers | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Yarlett | Trustee | 14 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 21/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 21 November 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 November 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PARENTS, SIBLINGS AND FAMILIES AFFECTED BY NEONATAL DEATH, STILLBIRTH OR MISCARRIAGE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISIONS OF MEMORY BOXES, SUPPORT PACKS AND BY PROVIDING EMOTIONAL SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Victor Way
Waddington
LINCOLN
LN5 9PH
- Phone:
- 07798796557
- Email:
- enquiries@edisonslight.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window