HOOLE VILLAGE MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of facilities for the benefit of local residents including use of village hall for general meetings, social, leisure, educational, recreation and sporting activities plus outdoor Tennis Courts and Bowling Green.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £8,650 from 1 government grant(s)
People

16 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 18 November 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HOWARD DAVIDSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Asbridge | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jaqueline Sherrington Scouts | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Wilkinson | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Sutton | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Smith | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Bayldon | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dianne Audrey Daniels Mrs | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDRA MOORCROFT | Trustee | 31 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Barrie Scott | Trustee | 07 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alan William Taylor | Trustee | 26 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Brown | Trustee | 26 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR STAN PICKLES | Trustee | 08 March 2012 |
|
|||||
EUNICE HOUGHTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN TAYLOR AUGHTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR RONNIE DALTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.43k | £336.49k | £128.76k | £84.98k | £74.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.94k | £287.44k | £90.71k | £46.43k | £55.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.36k | N/A | N/A | £8.65k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 26 May 2024 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 26 May 2024 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 04 April 2023 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 04 April 2023 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 14 July 2022 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 14 July 2022 | 136 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 04 April 2023 | 765 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 04 April 2023 | 765 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 23 SEP 2003
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
MUCH HOOLE AND LITTLE HOOLE, LANCAHSIRE AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mill House Barn
Moss House Lane
Much Hoole
Preston
PR4 4TE
- Phone:
- 07720470555
- Email:
- TOMB4U@OUTLOOK.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window